U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:19-cb-00012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Baumbach et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Criminal Case]
  • April 17, 2025: [Dismiss Criminal Case]
March, 2020
  • March 02, 2020: [Report - CVB]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Report - CVB]
  • February 14, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 28, 2020: [Audio File]
  • January 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 27, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 06, 2020: [Report - CVB]
  • January 02, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 02, 2020: [Report - CVB]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Audio File]
  • December 31, 2019: [Central Violations Bureau Updated Docket Sheet]
  • December 31, 2019: [Minutes - CVB]
  • December 20, 2019: [Report - CVB]
  • December 20, 2019: [Central Violations Bureau Docket Sheet and Tickets]
  • December 20, 2019: [Disclaimer - CVB]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.