U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-mj-03152-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Megia-Escoto
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Remark - Public]
  • January 07, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 06, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 03, 2020: [Consular Notification]
  • January 03, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 03, 2020: [Audio File]
  • January 03, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 03, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 03, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • December 30, 2019: [Criminal Cover Sheet]
  • December 30, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.