U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:20-mj-00006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Zavalta
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Remark - Public]
  • January 14, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 10, 2020: [Audio File]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 10, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 10, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 10, 2020: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 09, 2020: [Consular Notification]
  • January 09, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 09, 2020: [Interpreter Request for Pretrial Hearings (TEXT ONLY)]
  • January 09, 2020: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • January 08, 2020: [Complaint]
  • January 08, 2020: [Criminal Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.