U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:20-mj-00012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Young
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • February 03, 2020: [Commitment to Another District]
  • February 03, 2020: [Order]
  • February 03, 2020: [Waiver of Rule 5 Hearings]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Audio File]
  • January 31, 2020: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 15, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 14, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 10, 2020: [Audio File]
  • January 10, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 09, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 08, 2020: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • January 08, 2020: [Rule 5 Complaint - Out]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.