U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:20-mc-00005
  • Case Name: Raines et al v. Wingender
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 12, 2020: [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • February 21, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • February 20, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • February 19, 2020: [Affidavit and Praecipe for Summons in Garnishment]
  • February 19, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Letter by Clerk/Transmittal Letter]
  • January 10, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • January 10, 2020: [Registration of Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.