U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:20-cb-00001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hamilton et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 21, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 18, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 03, 2020: [Report - CVB]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Audio File]
  • July 07, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 01, 2020: [Audio File]
May, 2020
  • May 13, 2020: [Report - CVB]
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 01, 2020: [Report - CVB]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Report - CVB]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Criminal Case]
  • February 28, 2020: [Report - CVB]
  • February 28, 2020: [Dismiss Criminal Case]
  • February 26, 2020: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • February 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • February 26, 2020: [Report - CVB]
  • February 25, 2020: [Audio File]
  • February 25, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 25, 2020: [Vacate]
  • February 24, 2020: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • February 05, 2020: [Report - CVB]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 28, 2020: [Central Violations Bureau Updated Docket Sheet]
  • January 28, 2020: [Audio File]
  • January 28, 2020: [Order]
  • January 28, 2020: [Minutes - CVB]
  • January 16, 2020: [Central Violations Bureau Docket Sheet and Tickets]
  • January 16, 2020: [Disclaimer - CVB]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.