U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cb-03000-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Burnette et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Central Violations Bureau Updated Docket Sheet]
August, 2020
  • August 14, 2020: [Order]
  • August 06, 2020: [Audio File]
July, 2020
  • July 07, 2020: [Order]
  • July 02, 2020: [Central Violations Bureau Updated Docket Sheet]
  • July 02, 2020: [Audio File]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Returned Mail]
  • May 19, 2020: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • March 02, 2020: [Report - CVB]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Central Violations Bureau Updated Docket Sheet]
  • February 25, 2020: [Order]
  • February 20, 2020: [Audio File]
  • February 20, 2020: [Minutes - CVB]
  • February 18, 2020: [Returned Mail]
  • February 06, 2020: [Report - CVB]
  • February 05, 2020: [Report - CVB]
  • February 04, 2020: [Returned Mail]
  • February 03, 2020: [Remark - Public]
  • February 03, 2020: [Report - CVB]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 28, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 27, 2020: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • January 27, 2020: [Central Violations Bureau Docket Sheet and Tickets]
  • January 27, 2020: [Disclaimer - CVB]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.