U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:20-mj-00040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dennis
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 04, 2020: [Audio File]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 30, 2020: [Oral]
  • January 30, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 30, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 30, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 29, 2020: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • January 29, 2020: [Remark - Public]
  • January 29, 2020: [Notice of Unsealing]
  • January 28, 2020: [Criminal Cover Sheet]
  • January 28, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.