U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:20-cb-00002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Canarsky et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Criminal Case]
  • April 13, 2021: [Dismiss Criminal Case]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Remark - Public]
  • July 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Criminal Case]
  • July 29, 2020: [Dismiss Criminal Case]
  • July 28, 2020: [Audio File]
  • July 07, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 01, 2020: [Audio File]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • March 09, 2020: [Report - CVB]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Criminal Case]
  • February 28, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 28, 2020: [Dismiss Criminal Case]
  • February 25, 2020: [Central Violations Bureau Updated Docket Sheet]
  • February 25, 2020: [Audio File]
  • February 25, 2020: [Order]
  • February 25, 2020: [Minutes - CVB]
  • February 24, 2020: [Report - CVB]
  • February 21, 2020: [Report - CVB]
  • February 18, 2020: [Report - CVB]
  • February 13, 2020: [Central Violations Bureau Docket Sheet and Tickets]
  • February 13, 2020: [Disclaimer - CVB]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.