open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska

NEBRASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:20-40218-
    Party Name:Willow A Gottfried
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Motion/Notice to Allow Claims (batch)]
    Date Published:June 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:April 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:March 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Support Document]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Acknowledgment of Claim (batch)]
    Date Published:March 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Personal Financial Mgt Course Certificate]
    Date Published:March 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Pay Advice]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate Regarding Confirmation Chapter 12/13]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Service of EMPLOYER TO PAY TRUSTEE (batch)]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Clerks Evidence of Repeat Filing]
    Date Published:February 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Objection to Confirmation Deadline Updated (ADI)]
    Date Published:February 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Creditor Request for Notices (No PDF Required)]
    Date Published:February 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Laughlin, Kathleen [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.neb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?178607
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =