open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska

NEBRASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:20-80190-
    Party Name:Shauna Marie Roberts
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Close Bankruptcy Case 7 13 (Autodocket)]
    Date Published:June 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:May 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Discharging Debtor (Autodocket)]
    Date Published:May 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Ch 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution (341 Filings)]
    Date Published:April 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:March 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Certificate of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:March 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Creditor Request for Notices (No PDF Required)]
    Date Published:February 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Pay Advice]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 [Pay Advice]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Stalnaker, John [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.neb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?178606
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =