open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska

NEBRASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:20-40217-
    Party Name:Scott Gardner and Carolyn A Gardner
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Close Bankruptcy Case 7 13 (Autodocket)]
    Date Published:June 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:May 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Discharging Debtor (Autodocket)]
    Date Published:May 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Receipt of Final Installment Payment]
    Date Published:May 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Payment through Internet]
    Date Published:May 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Notice of Failure to Pay Filing Fee]
    Date Published:May 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Ch 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution (341 Filings)]
    Date Published:May 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Certificate of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:April 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Notice of Requirement for Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:April 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors (no pdf)]
    Date Published:March 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Verification of Matrix]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Schedule Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Schedule J]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Schedule I]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Schedule H]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Schedule G]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Schedule E/F]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Schedule D]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Schedule C]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Schedule A/B]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:February 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.neb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?178605
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =