U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-mj-03034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lopez-Zacarias
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset All Hearings]
  • April 22, 2020: [Restricted Order Pursuant to E-Government Act]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order]
  • March 16, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order of Detention]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 27, 2020: [Consular Notification]
  • February 27, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 26, 2020: [Audio File]
  • February 26, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 26, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • February 26, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 25, 2020: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • February 25, 2020: [Remark - Public]
  • February 25, 2020: [Notice of Unsealing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.