open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska

NEBRASKA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Nebraska
    Case Number:20-41072-
    Party Name:Natosha Michelle White
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:September 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Schedule C]
    Date Published:September 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [UST Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Employ]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Notice of Assets]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:September 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Certificate of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:August 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:August 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Clerks Evidence of Repeat Filing]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Creditor Request for Notices (No PDF Required)]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kelly, Philip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.neb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?180278
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =