U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:21-cv-00233
  • Case Name: Carroll v. Douglas County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Reply Brief]
  • December 19, 2022: [Extend]
  • December 12, 2022: [Reply Brief]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
  • December 05, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Attachment - Continued]
  • November 07, 2022: [Brief]
  • November 07, 2022: [Index]
  • November 07, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Extend]
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 21, 2022: [Extend]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Audio File - Restricted]
  • May 25, 2022: [Telephone Conference]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order - Text Only]
  • May 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset All Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 08, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • March 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 09, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 07, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 05, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 05, 2022: [Summons Requested]
  • January 05, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • January 03, 2022: [Amend]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Disclosure Document]
  • December 03, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 02, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of a Civil Case (NEW)]
  • December 01, 2021: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Jury Demand]
  • November 03, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 03, 2021: [Restricted Case Conference Instructions]
  • November 02, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1]
  • November 02, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 18, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 07, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • October 07, 2021: [Summons Requested]
  • October 07, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 01, 2021: [Memorandum and Order]
  • October 01, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
August, 2021
  • August 10, 2021: [Reply Brief]
  • August 10, 2021: [Index]
  • August 03, 2021: [Brief]
  • August 03, 2021: [Index]
  • August 03, 2021: [Response]
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [Brief]
  • July 13, 2021: [Index]
  • July 13, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 21, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • June 21, 2021: [Summons Requested]
  • June 21, 2021: [Assignment of Judges]
  • June 17, 2021: [Summons Requested]
  • June 17, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.