U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-03121
  • Case Name: Khare et al v. Mayorkas et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Remark - Public]
  • July 24, 2021: [Notice of Case Dismissal]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • June 21, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • June 21, 2021: [Assignment of Judges]
  • June 18, 2021: [Summons Requested]
  • June 18, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1]
  • June 18, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.