U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:21-cv-00235
  • Case Name: Benne v. Quick Med Claims, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Remark - Public]
  • October 04, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Audio File - Restricted]
  • August 16, 2022: [Settlement Order]
  • August 15, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • July 18, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Audio File]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Email Motion]
  • May 23, 2022: [Email]
  • May 13, 2022: [Certificate]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 05, 2022: [Extend]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Order]
  • April 22, 2022: [Audio File]
  • April 22, 2022: [Telephone Conference]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 18, 2022: [Oral]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 15, 2022: [Brief]
  • April 15, 2022: [Compel]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Certificate]
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of a Civil Case (NEW)]
  • September 07, 2021: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
August, 2021
  • August 05, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 05, 2021: [Restricted Order Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • August 05, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 04, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1]
  • August 04, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • June 22, 2021: [Assignment of Judges]
  • June 21, 2021: [Summons Requested]
  • June 21, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.