U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:21-cv-00237
  • Case Name: Richardson v. Women's Center for Advancement
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Stipulation for Dismissal]
  • January 04, 2023: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset All Deadlines]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset All Deadlines]
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 25, 2022: [Audio File - Restricted]
  • March 25, 2022: [Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of a Civil Case (NEW)]
  • March 24, 2022: [Telephone Conference]
  • March 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset All Hearings]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order - Text Only]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
  • March 02, 2022: [Brief]
  • March 02, 2022: [Consolidate Cases]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • January 11, 2022: [Amend]
  • January 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of a Civil Case (NEW)]
  • December 06, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 06, 2021: [Amend]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 03, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 03, 2021: [Extend]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • November 15, 2021: [Amend]
  • November 04, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 03, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 12, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 01, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 06, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of a Civil Case (NEW)]
  • August 05, 2021: [Protective Order]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 29, 2021: [Restricted Case Conference Instructions]
  • June 25, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1]
  • June 25, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • June 23, 2021: [Notice Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 22, 2021: [Assignment of Judges]
  • June 22, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.