U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:21-cv-00238
  • Case Name: Schellenberger v. Rosenblatt et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • January 19, 2023: [Strike]
  • January 19, 2023: [Index]
  • January 19, 2023: [Brief]
  • January 19, 2023: [Statement]
  • January 19, 2023: [Summary Judgment]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Audio File]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Request]
  • October 18, 2022: [Response]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 14, 2022: [Disclosure Document]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of a Civil Case (NEW)]
  • June 21, 2022: [Audio File]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Restricted Case Conference Instructions]
  • May 11, 2022: [Response]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Memorandum and Order]
  • April 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default]
  • February 14, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency (No Signature)]
  • February 14, 2022: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • February 11, 2022: [Response]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
  • January 25, 2022: [Strike]
  • January 24, 2022: [Response]
  • January 14, 2022: [Reply Brief]
  • January 13, 2022: [Response]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 20, 2021: [Brief]
  • December 20, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • December 03, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 23, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • November 23, 2021: [Extend]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset All Deadlines]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order]
  • October 18, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 08, 2021: [Response]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Order to Show Cause]
  • September 10, 2021: [Affidavit]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • August 11, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • July 28, 2021: [Supplement]
  • July 15, 2021: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • July 15, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • June 23, 2021: [Order - Pro Se GO 2020-01]
  • June 23, 2021: [Notice by Clerk (Pro Se Case)]
  • June 23, 2021: [Filing Fee Paid]
  • June 23, 2021: [Restricted Document Pursuant to E-Government Act]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.