U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:21-cv-00243
  • Case Name: Shanahan v. Juicify, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Case Transferred Out - District]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Change Venue]
  • September 02, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Change Venue]
  • August 27, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1]
  • August 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 12, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 12, 2021: [Notice Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
  • August 11, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
  • August 11, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 11, 2021: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 09, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • July 09, 2021: [Summons Requested]
  • July 09, 2021: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • June 28, 2021: [Assignment of Judges]
  • June 28, 2021: [Summons Requested]
  • June 28, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.