U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:21-cv-00241
  • Case Name: Brackett v. Horner et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Judgment - Pro Se]
  • May 18, 2022: [Memorandum and Order]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Memorandum and Order]
  • January 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pro Se Case Management Deadlines]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Restricted Motion pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • July 09, 2021: [Restricted Motion Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order]
  • July 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Pro Se Case Management Deadlines]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Order - Pro Se GO 2020-01]
  • June 29, 2021: [Notice by Clerk (Pro Se Case)]
  • June 29, 2021: [Complaint - Pro Se]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.