U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:21-cv-00244
  • Case Name: Smith v. Spanish Quotes, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Remark - Public]
  • December 15, 2021: [Notice of Case Dismissal]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order - Text Only]
  • December 15, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • December 14, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 06, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • November 22, 2021: [Summons Requested]
  • November 22, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave]
  • November 19, 2021: [Leave]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Certificate]
  • September 14, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • September 13, 2021: [Certificate]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of a Civil Case (NEW)]
  • September 10, 2021: [Order - Consent (TEXT ONLY)]
  • September 10, 2021: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
August, 2021
  • August 11, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1]
  • August 11, 2021: [Notice Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 10, 2021: [Restricted Case Conference Instructions]
  • August 10, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 10, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 06, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • July 05, 2021: [Summons Requested]
  • July 05, 2021: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • June 29, 2021: [Assignment of Judges]
  • June 29, 2021: [Summons Requested]
  • June 29, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.