U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:21-cv-00245
  • Case Name: Townsell v. Keele
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Remark - Public]
  • March 07, 2022: [Dismiss]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Settlement Order]
  • February 07, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 15, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 12, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of a Civil Case (NEW)]
  • September 23, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order - Consent (TEXT ONLY)]
  • September 22, 2021: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 23, 2021: [Restricted Order Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • August 23, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
  • July 21, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • June 30, 2021: [Assignment of Judges]
  • June 30, 2021: [Summons Requested]
  • June 30, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.