U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:21-cv-00246
  • Case Name: Miller v. Omaha Dep of Corrections et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Judgment - Pro Se]
  • August 31, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 30, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • August 17, 2021: [Memorandum and Order]
  • August 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Pro Se Case Management Deadlines]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Prisoner Filing Fee Paid]
  • July 16, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 16, 2021: [Memorandum and Order]
  • July 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Pro Se Case Management Deadlines]
  • July 15, 2021: [Prisoner/Non-Prisoner Statement]
  • July 01, 2021: [Letter by Clerk Requesting Trust Account Statement]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order - Pro Se GO 2020-01]
  • July 01, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 01, 2021: [Notice by Clerk (Pro Se Case)]
  • July 01, 2021: [Complaint - Pro Se]
  • July 01, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.