U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:21-cv-00234
  • Case Name: Farmers Mutual Insurance of Nebraska v. Deere & Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • October 06, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 23, 2022: [Extend]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 20, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Certificate]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 28, 2022: [Extend]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 08, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of a Civil Case (NEW)]
  • August 16, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 13, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order - Text Only]
  • August 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset All Hearings]
  • August 03, 2021: [Reassignment Order]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order - Consent (TEXT ONLY)]
  • August 02, 2021: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1]
  • July 07, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1]
  • July 07, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 02, 2021: [Restricted Case Conference Instructions]
  • July 01, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.