U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-03133
  • Case Name: Unger v. Bockmann, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 17, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Civil Case]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Stipulation for Dismissal]
  • December 10, 2021: [Brief]
  • December 10, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Order]
  • November 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset All Deadlines]
  • November 10, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 01, 2021: [Certificate]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 18, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of a Civil Case (NEW)]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order - Consent (TEXT ONLY)]
  • September 30, 2021: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Restricted Case Conference Instructions]
  • August 30, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 27, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 20, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1]
  • August 06, 2021: [Notice Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 05, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 05, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • July 07, 2021: [Assignment of Judges]
  • July 07, 2021: [Summons Requested]
  • July 07, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.