U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:21-cv-00251
  • Case Name: Jones v. Nebraska Department of Correctional Services et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Scheduling Letter]
  • October 21, 2022: [Letter by Clerk/Transmittal Letter]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • October 21, 2022: [Notification of Appeal and NOA Supplement]
  • October 20, 2022: [Brief]
  • October 20, 2022: [Stay]
  • October 20, 2022: [Interlocutory Appeal]
  • October 19, 2022: [Mandate/Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Brief]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 20, 2022: [Mandate/Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Brief]
  • August 23, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 23, 2022: [Copy of Order from USCA]
  • August 23, 2022: [Letter by Clerk/Transmittal Letter]
  • August 22, 2022: [Notification of Appeal and NOA Supplement]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Objection]
  • August 09, 2022: [Objection]
  • August 09, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 09, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 09, 2022: [Interlocutory Appeal]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 27, 2022: [Memorandum and Order]
  • July 27, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 24, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Objection]
  • March 02, 2022: [Memorandum and Order]
  • March 02, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Brief]
  • February 24, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • February 07, 2022: [Summons Issued]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Objection to Magistrate Judge Order]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Objection]
  • November 12, 2021: [Objection]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Order to Show Cause]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Response]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Order]
  • August 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset All Deadlines]
  • August 24, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 17, 2021: [Reassignment Order]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order]
  • August 13, 2021: [Reassignment Order]
  • August 13, 2021: [Order - Text Only]
  • August 09, 2021: [Filing Fee Paid]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Memorandum and Order]
  • July 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Pro Se Case Management Deadlines]
  • July 27, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 21, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order]
  • July 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Pro Se Case Management Deadlines]
  • July 08, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order - Pro Se GO 2020-01]
  • July 08, 2021: [Notice by Clerk (Pro Se Case)]
  • July 08, 2021: [Complaint - Pro Se]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.