U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:21-cv-00252
  • Case Name: Westjohn v. Seldin Co.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Letter by Clerk/Transmittal Letter]
  • August 31, 2022: [Scheduling Letter]
  • August 31, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 30, 2022: [Notification of Appeal and NOA Supplement]
  • August 30, 2022: [Appeal Fee Paid]
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Appeal to USCA]
  • August 29, 2022: [Copy of IFP Memo]
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice of Appeal to USCA]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 11, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 01, 2022: [Memorandum and Order]
  • June 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Response]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Strike]
  • April 28, 2022: [Brief]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave]
  • March 21, 2022: [Reply Brief]
  • March 21, 2022: [Leave]
  • March 10, 2022: [Brief]
  • March 10, 2022: [Extend]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Extend]
  • February 01, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 17, 2022: [Brief]
  • January 17, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • January 04, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 04, 2022: [Memorandum and Order]
  • January 04, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Amend]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Reassignment Order]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 22, 2021: [Reply Brief]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • September 21, 2021: [Amend]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 16, 2021: [Extend]
  • September 15, 2021: [Brief]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Reassignment Order]
  • August 23, 2021: [Brief]
  • August 23, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Summons Requested]
  • July 27, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • July 27, 2021: [Order - Text Only]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order - Pro Se GO 2020-01]
  • July 09, 2021: [Notice by Clerk (Pro Se Case)]
  • July 09, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.