U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:20-cv-00520
  • Case Name: Frazier v. Smith et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Mandate/Judgment]
  • September 07, 2022: [Copy of Order from USCA]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Copy of Order from USCA]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Mandate/Judgment]
  • July 29, 2022: [Opinion (Copy) of USCA]
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Prisoner/Non-Prisoner Statement]
  • February 17, 2022: [Letter by Clerk Requesting Trust Account Statement]
  • February 15, 2022: [Scheduling Letter]
  • February 15, 2022: [Copy of Order from USCA]
  • February 15, 2022: [Letter]
  • February 15, 2022: [Letter by Clerk/Transmittal Letter]
  • February 14, 2022: [Notification of Appeal and NOA Supplement]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 10, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice of Appeal to USCA]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Judgment - Pro Se]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Default Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 29, 2021: [Brief]
  • November 19, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • November 19, 2021: [Brief]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 14, 2021: [Brief]
  • October 12, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • October 08, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Index]
  • September 17, 2021: [Brief]
  • September 17, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Certificate]
  • August 16, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 06, 2021: [Order]
  • August 06, 2021: [Telephone Conference]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • July 30, 2021: [Restricted Order Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • July 28, 2021: [Reassignment Order]
  • July 28, 2021: [Order]
  • July 28, 2021: [Status Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.