U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:21-cv-00319
  • Case Name: Farm Credit Services of America, PCA v. Peichel et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Remark - Public]
  • April 28, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Email Motion]
  • April 25, 2022: [Email]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Settlement Order]
  • January 14, 2022: [Index]
  • January 14, 2022: [Reply Brief]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 13, 2021: [Extend]
  • December 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • December 07, 2021: [Index]
  • December 07, 2021: [Brief]
  • December 07, 2021: [Amend]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Certificate]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
  • November 18, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
  • November 05, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of a Civil Case (NEW)]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order - Consent (TEXT ONLY)]
  • November 05, 2021: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • November 01, 2021: [Index]
  • November 01, 2021: [Brief]
  • November 01, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Restricted Case Conference Instructions]
  • October 05, 2021: [Scheduling Order - Consent]
  • October 05, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 07, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1]
  • September 03, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 03, 2021: [Summons Requested]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Order on Application for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically]
  • August 23, 2021: [Notice Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 23, 2021: [Assignment of Judges]
  • August 23, 2021: [Attachment - Continued]
  • August 20, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.