U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-03091
  • Case Name: Tyler v. Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Mandate/Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Mandate/Judgment]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Copy of Order from USCA]
  • December 06, 2021: [Letter by Clerk/Transmittal Letter]
  • December 02, 2021: [Notification of Appeal and NOA Supplement]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Order]
  • October 25, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset All Deadlines]
  • October 25, 2021: [Copy of IFP Memo]
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice of Appeal to USCA]
  • October 12, 2021: [Judgment - Pro Se]
  • October 12, 2021: [Memorandum and Order]
  • October 12, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 07, 2021: [Returned Mail]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Returned Mail]
  • September 21, 2021: [Reassignment Order]
  • September 21, 2021: [Findings and Recommendation]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order]
  • September 21, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 13, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Order to Show Cause]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.