U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:21-cv-00321
  • Case Name: United States of America v. $1,638,055.00 United States Currency
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Judgment - Default]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order]
  • December 08, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order]
  • November 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 17, 2021: [Response]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order]
  • November 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 03, 2021: [Set Aside Default]
  • November 03, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Default Judgment]
  • October 26, 2021: [Clerk's Entry of Default]
  • October 26, 2021: [Index]
  • October 26, 2021: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • October 25, 2021: [Declaration]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Claim]
  • September 08, 2021: [Return of Service]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Return of Service]
  • August 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 25, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 24, 2021: [Warrant In Rem Issued]
  • August 24, 2021: [Assignment of Judges]
  • August 24, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 24, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.