U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:21-cv-00323
  • Case Name: Central States Life & Health Company of Omaha v. Medamerica Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Status Conference]
  • January 09, 2023: [Certificate]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [Certificate]
  • November 21, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • November 14, 2022: [Certificate]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Certificate]
  • September 06, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • August 17, 2022: [Amend]
  • August 12, 2022: [Certificate]
  • August 11, 2022: [Certificate]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of a Civil Case (NEW)]
  • July 08, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 10, 2022: [Restricted Case Conference Instructions]
  • June 10, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Reply]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Application for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically]
  • December 17, 2021: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 16, 2021: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 15, 2021: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 01, 2021: [Brief]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1]
  • October 29, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • October 20, 2021: [Brief]
  • October 20, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order on Email Motion]
  • October 19, 2021: [Email]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Returned Mail]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • September 17, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • September 17, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 08, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1]
  • August 25, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • August 25, 2021: [Notice Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 25, 2021: [Assignment of Judges]
  • August 25, 2021: [Summons Requested]
  • August 24, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.