U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-03161
  • Case Name: Headley v. Omaha Construction Industry Pension Plan et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 13, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • June 06, 2022: [Settlement Order]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • April 08, 2022: [Certificate]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Certificate]
  • March 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Disclosure Document]
  • December 13, 2021: [Disclosure Document]
  • December 08, 2021: [Certificate]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of a Civil Case (NEW)]
  • December 07, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • December 06, 2021: [Disclosure Document]
  • December 03, 2021: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Application for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically]
  • December 01, 2021: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 04, 2021: [Restricted Case Conference Instructions]
  • November 03, 2021: [Memorandum and Order]
  • November 03, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • November 03, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Reply Brief]
  • October 15, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1]
  • October 14, 2021: [Brief]
  • October 04, 2021: [Brief]
  • October 04, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 01, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 30, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 29, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 29, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1]
  • September 24, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1]
  • September 20, 2021: [Notice Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
  • September 16, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
  • September 09, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 02, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • August 26, 2021: [Summons Requested]
  • August 26, 2021: [Assignment of Judges]
  • August 26, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.