U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-03197
  • Case Name: EMC Insurance Company v. Robertson-Ceco II Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 14, 2022: [Dismiss]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Settlement Order]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Certificate]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of a Civil Case (NEW)]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order - Consent (TEXT ONLY)]
  • October 29, 2021: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 20, 2021: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 11, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1]
  • October 05, 2021: [Restricted Order Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • October 05, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 01, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1]
  • September 28, 2021: [Notice Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 27, 2021: [Assignment of Judges]
  • September 27, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.