U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:21-cv-00376
  • Case Name: Kujath v. City of Omaha et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Reply Brief]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • July 11, 2022: [Brief]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 01, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Attachment - Continued]
  • June 10, 2022: [Index]
  • June 10, 2022: [Brief]
  • June 10, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • May 06, 2022: [Restricted Case Conference Instructions]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of a Civil Case (NEW)]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order - Text Only]
  • March 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset All Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Status Conference]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 17, 2021: [Extend]
  • November 17, 2021: [Certificate]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of a Civil Case (NEW)]
  • November 17, 2021: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Restricted Case Conference Instructions]
  • October 18, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 06, 2021: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Assignment of Judges]
  • September 27, 2021: [Filing Fee Paid]
  • September 27, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.