U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-03040
  • Case Name: Closser v. P.C.C.W. Teleservices (US) Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 02, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Settlement Order]
  • August 25, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 21, 2022: [Extend]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • May 24, 2022: [Telephone Conference]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 16, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset All Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Remark - Public]
  • December 01, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of a Civil Case (NEW)]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • November 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset All Deadlines]
  • November 16, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 16, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order on Email Motion]
  • October 14, 2021: [Email]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order - Text Only]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Subpoena Returned]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.