U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:21-cv-00380
  • Case Name: Gatus v. Peterson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Judgment - Pro Se]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Index]
  • July 06, 2022: [Brief]
  • July 06, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order Setting Schedule for Progression of a Pro Se Case]
  • June 21, 2022: [Memorandum and Order]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Order]
  • May 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pro Se Case Management Deadlines]
  • May 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Stay]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of a Civil Case (NEW)]
  • March 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pro Se Case Management Deadlines]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 14, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • February 03, 2022: [Amend]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 24, 2022: [Memorandum and Order]
  • January 12, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Memorandum and Order]
  • December 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Pro Se Case Management Deadlines]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Supplement]
  • November 29, 2021: [Prisoner Filing Fee Paid]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 01, 2021: [Prisoner/Non-Prisoner Statement]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Letter by Clerk Requesting Trust Account Statement]
  • October 12, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 01, 2021: [Memorandum and Order]
  • October 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Pro Se Case Management Deadlines]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Order - Pro Se GO 2020-01]
  • September 29, 2021: [Notice by Clerk (Pro Se Case)]
  • September 29, 2021: [Complaint - Pro Se]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.