U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-03092
  • Case Name: Miller v. Lottman et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Judgment - Pro Se]
  • February 14, 2022: [Memorandum and Order]
  • February 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 07, 2022: [Brief]
  • February 01, 2022: [Dismiss]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Brief]
  • January 24, 2022: [Leave]
  • January 19, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 13, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 13, 2022: [Supplement]
  • January 13, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • January 10, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 10, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 10, 2022: [Brief]
  • January 10, 2022: [Objection]
  • January 06, 2022: [Memorandum and Order]
  • January 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 03, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 03, 2022: [Amend]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Amend]
  • December 20, 2021: [Certificate]
  • December 20, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 13, 2021: [Amend]
  • December 07, 2021: [Memorandum and Order]
  • December 07, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 06, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 06, 2021: [Disclosure Document]
  • December 06, 2021: [Leave]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Order Setting Schedule for Progression of a Pro Se Case]
  • November 10, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.