U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:21-cv-00384
  • Case Name: In Re: Alexandra Tiffany Myers-Terrell
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Order]
  • March 02, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Dismiss]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Index]
  • November 15, 2021: [Compel]
October, 2021
  • October 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Assignment of Judges]
  • September 30, 2021: [Brief]
  • September 30, 2021: [Index]
  • September 30, 2021: [Motion to Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.