U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-03221
  • Case Name: Sklenar v. PCA Acquisitions V, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 16, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Settlement Order]
  • April 08, 2022: [Certificate]
  • April 01, 2022: [Restricted Case Conference Instructions]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Certificate]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • February 15, 2022: [Certificate]
  • February 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of a Civil Case (NEW)]
  • January 03, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 21, 2021: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 16, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1]
  • December 07, 2021: [Jury Demand]
  • December 03, 2021: [Notice Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 03, 2021: [Restricted Order Pursuant to E-Government Act]
  • December 03, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 02, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Stipulation]
  • October 28, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • October 28, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1]
  • October 13, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 01, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • October 01, 2021: [Assignment of Judges]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Summons Requested]
  • September 30, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.