U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:21-cv-00386
  • Case Name: Halo Synergy Group, et al v. Marsh and McLennan Agency, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Order]
  • May 15, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset All Deadlines]
  • May 01, 2025: [Status Report]
November, 2024
  • November 12, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset All Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • March 30, 2022: [Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of a Civil Case (NEW)]
  • March 25, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 23, 2022: [Restricted Case Conference Instructions]
  • February 21, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
  • January 21, 2022: [Memorandum and Order]
  • January 21, 2022: [Strike Order]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Reply Brief]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 17, 2021: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 16, 2021: [Continue]
  • November 12, 2021: [Amend]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave]
  • November 12, 2021: [Leave]
  • November 10, 2021: [Brief]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Reassignment Order]
  • October 20, 2021: [Index]
  • October 20, 2021: [Brief]
  • October 20, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • October 14, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1]
  • October 13, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
  • October 01, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
  • October 01, 2021: [Notice Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Assignment of Judges]
  • September 30, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.