U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:22-cv-00076
  • Case Name: RSI, Inc. v. Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Remark - Public]
  • October 18, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Disclosure Document]
  • April 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of a Civil Case (NEW)]
  • April 07, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1]
  • March 09, 2022: [Restricted Case Conference Instructions]
  • March 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 04, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • March 01, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.