U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:22-cv-00094
  • Case Name: Schauer v. Kijakazi
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Copy of Order from USCA]
  • January 03, 2023: [Scheduling Letter]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Notification of Appeal and NOA Supplement]
  • December 30, 2022: [Order]
  • December 30, 2022: [Copy of IFP Memo]
  • December 29, 2022: [Notice of Appeal to USCA]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion Reversing the Commissioner's Decision]
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion Affirming the Commissioner's Decision]
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Reply Brief]
  • August 01, 2022: [Brief]
  • August 01, 2022: [Affirming Commissioner's Decision]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Brief]
  • July 01, 2022: [Reversing Commissioner's Decision]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 31, 2022: [Certificate]
  • May 31, 2022: [Social Security Administrative Record]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 25, 2022: [Summons Requested]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order - Social Security GO 2015-05]
  • March 14, 2022: [Assignment of Judges]
  • March 11, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 11, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.