U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-03040
  • Case Name: Vala v. Miller, et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Reassignment Order]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset All Deadlines]
  • November 23, 2022: [Status Report]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order]
  • October 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Status Report]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • July 26, 2022: [Stay]
  • July 22, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
  • May 23, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • March 14, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 14, 2022: [Assignment of Judges]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.