U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-03042
  • Case Name: Jovancic v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Remark - Public]
  • May 18, 2022: [Notice of Case Dismissal]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
  • May 16, 2022: [Extend]
  • May 16, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • March 23, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 18, 2022: [Summons Requested]
  • March 15, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 15, 2022: [Assignment of Judges]
  • March 15, 2022: [Summons Requested]
  • March 15, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.