U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:22-cv-00096
  • Case Name: The Prudential Insurance Company of America v. Woodward et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 11, 2022: [Default Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 09, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of a Civil Case (NEW)]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • August 23, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 23, 2022: [Restricted Case Conference Instructions]
  • August 23, 2022: [Clerk's Entry of Default]
  • August 23, 2022: [Strike Order]
  • August 22, 2022: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • August 22, 2022: [Dismiss Party]
  • August 17, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 08, 2022: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • August 08, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 08, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 05, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 05, 2022: [Crossclaim]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 20, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • July 19, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 19, 2022: [Strike]
  • July 19, 2022: [Summons Requested]
  • July 18, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • July 15, 2022: [Amend]
  • July 14, 2022: [Amend]
  • July 14, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 08, 2022: [Answer to Crossclaim]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • June 17, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 17, 2022: [Crossclaim]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1]
  • March 18, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 17, 2022: [Summons Requested]
  • March 16, 2022: [Notice Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 16, 2022: [Assignment of Judges]
  • March 16, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.