U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:22-cv-00098
  • Case Name: The Prudential Insurance Company of America v. Crocker et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • January 04, 2023: [Restricted Case Conference Instructions]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Receipt (Interpleader Deposit Received) (28 U.S.C. Section 1335)]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Receipt (Monetary)]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of a Civil Case (NEW)]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Certificate]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order]
  • August 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset All Deadlines]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order]
  • August 23, 2022: [Sua Sponte Order Authorizing Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335)]
  • August 22, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Remark - Public]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 01, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
  • May 31, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading]
  • May 11, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 27, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 07, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 18, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • March 17, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1]
  • March 17, 2022: [Summons Requested]
  • March 17, 2022: [Notice Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 17, 2022: [Assignment of Judges]
  • March 17, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.