U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 8:22-cv-00097
  • Case Name: Harpster v. FBI et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Judgment - Pro Se]
  • August 30, 2022: [Memorandum and Order]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Returned Mail]
  • July 18, 2022: [Memorandum and Order]
  • July 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pro Se Case Management Deadlines]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Order]
  • March 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order - Pro Se GO 2020-01]
  • March 17, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 17, 2022: [Notice by Clerk (Pro Se Case)]
  • March 17, 2022: [Complaint - Pro Se]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.