U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Nebraska

nebraska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Nebraska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-03043
  • Case Name: Savage v. Frakes
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Substitute Party]
  • October 05, 2022: [Reply Brief]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Memorandum and Order]
  • September 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset All Deadlines]
  • September 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pro Se Case Management Deadlines]
  • September 08, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 01, 2022: [Brief]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pro Se Case Management Deadlines]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Brief]
  • August 01, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [State Court Records]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 19, 2022: [Memorandum and Order]
  • May 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pro Se Case Management Deadlines]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • March 18, 2022: [Prisoner Filing Fee Paid]
  • March 18, 2022: [Notice by Clerk (Pro Se Case)]
  • March 18, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.